+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 14, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 168.
- Committee on The Budget discharged.
- Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 111-299 , Part III.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 111-299 , Part II.
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 111-299 , Part I.
On July 31, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 28.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 21, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 20, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 17, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 18.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 22.
On July 16, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 15, 2009 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to House Budget
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Education and Labor
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Oversight and Government Reform, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor