+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On September 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7796-7798)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 14, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to the Consensus Calendar, Calendar No. 2.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
- The Chair announced the Speaker's designation, pursuant to clause 7(a)(1) of rule XV, of H. R. 3173 as the measure on the Consensus Calendar to be considered this week.
- Ms. DelBene moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7796-7804)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3173.
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
On July 12, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to place bill on Consensus Calendar filed by Ms. DelBene.
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (318)
Type:
Primary Sponsor