+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
On February 4, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On September 9, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On August 26, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor