+ − Summary
+ − Actions (9)
On June 27, 1984 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 1984 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 15, 1983 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 6, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On September 30, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Treasury.
On August 15, 1983 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Treasury, Commerce, ITC.
On May 31, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On May 26, 1983 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor