+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On December 13, 2019 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-89. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On November 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On November 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6767)
On November 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On October 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On October 16, 2019 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8172-8173)
- Mr. Rouda moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3144.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8172)
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor