+ − Summary
+ − Actions (14)
On February 6, 1990 in the House:
- On motion to recommit Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Boucher moved to recommit to Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
On December 12, 1989 in the House:
- See H.R.2459 .
On November 21, 1989 in the House:
- By request of Mr. Sensenbrenner the House passed over the measure without prejudice.
- Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration.
On November 17, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 15.
- Reported by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 101-369.
On September 26, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee On Merchant Marine Discharged.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee On Merchant Marine.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOT.
On August 3, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor