+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On June 8, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From OMB.
On June 3, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From OPM.
On May 4, 1988 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 24, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
- Executive Comment Requested from OMB, OPM, GAO.
On August 6, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor