+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
On December 13, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Smith moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 313 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 12, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-324 , Part I.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 222.
On October 6, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 7.
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor