+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Favorable Executive Comment Received from USDA.
On November 1, 1993 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 103-129.
- Signed by President.
On October 20, 1993 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 13, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 6, 1993 in the House:
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Con. Res. 160 , enrollment corrections have been made.
On October 5, 1993 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 4, 1993 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On October 4, 1993 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 30, 1993 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On September 28, 1993 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. de la Garza moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On September 23, 1993 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor