+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 30, 2004 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 108-223.
- Signed by President.
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On November 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On November 4, 2003 in the House:
- Mrs. Capito moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3118 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 15, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 110.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 108-317 .
On October 1, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 24, 2003 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 18, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On September 17, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor