+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 520.
- Committee on Transportation discharged.
- Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
- Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged.
On December 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure for a period ending not later than Dec. 21, 2012 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1 of rule X.
- Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology for a period ending not later than Dec. 21, 2012 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1 of rule X.
- Referred jointly and sequentially to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce for a period ending not later than Dec. 21, 2012 for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdication of that committee pursuant to clause 1 of rule X.
- Reported by the Committee on 112-717, Part I.
On October 13, 2011 in the House:
- Provisions of the following measures were offered as amendments to H.R. 3116 but not adopted during Committee consideration: H.R. 176 , H.R. 1105 , H.R. 2269 , and H.R 3011 .
- Provisions of the following measures were adopted as amendments to H.R. 3116 during committee consideration: H.R. 607 , H.R. 679 , H.R. 1505 , H.R. 1741 , H.R. 1900 , H.R. 2000 , H.R. 2356 , H.R. 2849 , H.R. 3173 , and H.Res 4729 .
- Provisions of the following measures were included in H.R. 3116 , as introduced: H.R. 915 , H.R. 1299 , H.R. 1411 , H.R. 1922 , H.R. 2042 , H.R. 2356 , H.R. 2623 , and H.R. 2764 . For other action see legislative histories under Legislation Referred.
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 12.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 6, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor