+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3111 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Rahall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 319.
- Committee on Armed Services discharged.
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- House Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Feb. 1, 2008.
On December 19, 2007 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 110-506 , Part I.
- House Committee on Armed Services Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Jan. 15, 2008.
On October 10, 2007 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
- Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 27, 2007 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 14, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
On July 23, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
On July 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Natural Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor