+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 21, 2022 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 117-256.
- Signed by President.
On December 16, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 9, 2022 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7083)
- Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7083)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On July 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On July 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7129)
On July 26, 2022 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7129)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 310.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7129-7131)
- Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (295)
Type:
Primary Sponsor