+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On October 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On October 21, 2003 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3077 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Hoekstra moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 8, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 185.
- Reported by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 108-308 .
On September 25, 2003 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 17, 2003 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 15, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Select Education.
On September 11, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor