+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3486)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3070.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3486-3487)
- Mr. Hardy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-517.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans.
On July 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor