+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 1988 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On September 23, 1987 in the House:
- See H.R.791 .
On August 13, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Water Resources.
On August 3, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On July 30, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Public Works and Transportation.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor