+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Hastings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 306 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On December 1, 2011 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-310 .
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 210.
On October 5, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor