+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 6, 1996 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 104-141.
- Signed by President.
On April 25, 1996 in the House:
- Presented to President.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 24, 1996 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On April 24, 1996 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.
On April 23, 1996 in the House:
- Called up from the Corrections Calendar for consideration.
- Considered from the Corrections Calendar.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate.
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- On passage Passed by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Corrections Calendar, Calendar No. 16.
On March 28, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 238.
- Reported by the Committee on Economic and Educational. H. Rept. 104-504 .
On March 14, 1996 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On March 7, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Economic and Educational Opportunities.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor