+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On December 4, 2001 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 107-313 , Part I.
On October 31, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 16, 2001 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 15, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
On October 11, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 4, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsors (81)
Patrick J. Toomey
Type:
Primary Sponsor