+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 17, 1990 in the House:
- See H.R.4653 .
On October 23, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on House action received in Senate and held at desk: House amendment to Senate amendment.
On October 22, 1990 in the Senate:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Fascell asked unanimous consent that the House agree with an amendment to the Senate amendment.
On July 10, 1990 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On June 29, 1990 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed conferees Packwood; Heinz by unanimous consent for any provisions regarding sanctions upon imports into the United States.
- Senate appointed conferees Bentsen; Moynihan; Baucus; Helms; Pressler; McConnell; Garn by unanimous consent for any provisions regarding sanctions upon imports into the United States.
- Senate appointed conferees Pell; Sarbanes; Dodd; Kerry; Riegle by unanimous consent.
On May 17, 1990 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on its amendments, requested a conference.
- Passed Senate in lieu of S. 195 with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 92-0.
- Senate struck all after the Enacting Clause and substituted the language of S. 195 amended.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On November 15, 1989 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 382.
On November 13, 1989 in the House:
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Fascell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Broomfield demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 8, 1989 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 101-334, Part II.
- Ordered to be Reported Without Recommendation.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 7, 1989 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Foreign Affairs. H. Rept. 101-334, Part I.
On November 1, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 15, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on International Development, Finance, Trade, and Monetary Policy.
On August 2, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
On July 27, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor