+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 7, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.5244 .
On June 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
On June 13, 1994 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 9, 1994 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 297.
- Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 103-538.
On May 17, 1994 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 6, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor