+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- By Senator Johnston from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 102-463. Additional views filed.
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 8, 1992 in the House:
- See H.R.6184 .
On October 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
On September 24, 1992 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 731.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
On September 22, 1992 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On March 27, 1992 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On March 26, 1992 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On March 24, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 102-466.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 277.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On February 19, 1992 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported.
On February 6, 1992 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
On November 18, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On October 25, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
On July 30, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 24, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor