+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 116-230.
- Signed by President.
On December 11, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7220-7221)
On October 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 30, 2020 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5070)
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5070)
- Committee on Oversight and Reform discharged.
- Mr. Connolly asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
On December 19, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor