+ − Summary
+ − Actions (17)
On August 3, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
On July 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Armed Services
- Referred to House Judiciary
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
- Referred to House House Administration
- Referred to House Education and Labor
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
- Referred to House Intelligence
- Referred to House Foreign Affairs
- Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, the Judiciary, Ways and Means, Oversight and Government Reform, House Administration, Education and Labor, Veterans' Affairs, Transportation and Infrastructure, Intelligence , and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor