+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
On July 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), House Administration, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor