+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 13, 2001 in the House:
- See H.R.1836 .
On March 9, 2001 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On March 8, 2001 in the House:
- H.AMDT.8 The previous question was ordered on the amendment without objection.
- Rule H. Res. 83 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 83 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. The amendment recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
- H.AMDT.7 Amendment reported by the House Committee on Ways and Means. An amendment considered as adopted pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 83 .
- H.AMDT.7 On agreeing to the Ways and Means amendment Agreed to pursuant to H. Res. 83 .
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3 as amended, pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 83 .
- DEBATE - Pursuant to H. Res 83 , the House is proceeding with one hour of debate on the amendment offered by Mr. Rangel.
- H.AMDT.8 Amendment in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Rangel. Amendment sought to create a new 12 percent tax rate ; increase the earned income tax credit; create a standard deduction for married couples equal to twice the standard available to single individuals; and provide marriage penalty relief in the earned income credit and the rate reductions.
- H.AMDT.8 On agreeing to the Rangel amendment Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 155 - 273 .
- Mr. Berry moved to reconsider the vote.
- Mr. Thomas moved to table the motion to reconsider the vote.
- On motion to table the motion to reconsider the vote Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 197 .
- Mr. Stenholm moved to recommit with instructions to Ways and Means.
- DEBATE - The House has proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Stenholm motion to recommit.
- On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by recorded vote: 204 - 221 .
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 230 - 198 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On March 7, 2001 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 83 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. All points of order against consideration of the bill are waived. The amendment recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted. Measure will be considered read. A specified amendment is in order.
On March 6, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 6.
- Reported by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 107-7 .
On March 1, 2001 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On February 28, 2001 in the House:
- Committee Hearings Held Prior to Introduction .
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Amendments (2)
H.AMDT.7
An amendment considered as adopted pursuant to the provisions of
H.AMDT.8
Amendment sought to create a new 12 percent tax rate (phased in through 2003, for the first $20,000 of taxable income); increase the earned income tax credit; create a standard deduction for married couples equal to twice the standard available to single individuals; and provide marriage penalty relief in the earned income credit and the rate reductions.
+ − Vote
March 8, 2001: On Motion to Recommit with Instructions
- Yeas: 204
- Nays: 221
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor