+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On June 25, 2018 in the House:
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5611-5620)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 299.
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 382 - 0 (Roll no. 289). (text: CR H5611-5614)
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5620-5621)
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 523.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-680.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
+ − Sponsors (327)
Type:
Primary Sponsor