+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 115-77. (TXT | PDF)
- Signed by President.
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On October 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6590-6591)
On October 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7952-7953)
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7952-7954)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2989.
- Mr. Russell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On October 5, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 245.
- Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-340.
On July 19, 2017 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E864-865)
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor