+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 112-107.
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On April 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On April 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 371.
On November 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
On November 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On November 14, 2011 in the House:
- Mr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 298 .
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 391 - 0 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 3, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy .
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor