+ − Summary
+ − Actions (8)
On August 6, 1998 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 18, 1998 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 19, 1997 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On November 9, 1997 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On November 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor