+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On September 21, 2004 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2966 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Pearce moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On June 30, 2004 in the House:
- Committee on Agriculture discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 339.
On May 20, 2004 in the House:
- House Committee on Agriculture Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than June 30, 2004.
- Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 108-513 , Part I.
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On April 22, 2004 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 30, 2003 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, Nutrition and Forestry.
On July 27, 2003 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA, Interior.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries Conservation, Wildlife and Oceans.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Recreation and Public Lands.
On July 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture
- Referred to House Resources
- Referred to the Committee on Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor