+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 13, 1986 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On November 19, 1985 in the House:
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On October 30, 1985 in the House:
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 99-344 .
On September 23, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On September 18, 1985 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 17, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On July 16, 1985 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on General Oversight, Northwest Power, and Forest Management.
On July 15, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
On July 12, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Natural Resources, Agricultural Research, and Environment.
On July 10, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Science and Technology.
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor