+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On April 23, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On October 5, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On October 2, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On September 25, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to House Energy and Commerce
- Referred to House Ways and Means
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor