+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On October 3, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Johnston without amendment. With written report No. 101-495.
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 918.
On September 19, 1990 in the Senate:
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On August 2, 1990 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Public Lands, National Parks.
On August 1, 1990 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 30, 1990 in the House:
- On ordering a second Agreed to without objection.
- Mr. Vento moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Mr. Lagomarsino demanded a second on the motion to suspend the rules.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On October 18, 1989 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
- Reported by the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. H. Rept. 101-295.
On October 11, 1989 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On October 5, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
On September 28, 1989 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 8, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 20, 1989 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor