+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-114.
- Signed by President.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3192)
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4447)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2939.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4447-4449)
- Mr. Huizenga (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (296)
Type:
Primary Sponsor