+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 19, 2009 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 111-60.
- Signed by President.
On August 11, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On August 6, 2009 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On August 5, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On August 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On August 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151.
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman without amendment. With written report No. 111-68 .
- Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
On July 22, 2009 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 418 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 21, 2009 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2938 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Costello moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On July 19, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Environment.
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor