+ − Summary
+ − Actions (6)
On July 1, 1988 in the House:
- Provisions of Measure Incorporated Into H.R.2470 .
On November 3, 1987 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On July 20, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
On July 16, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
On July 14, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor