+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 22, 1992 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. H. Rept. 102-885, Part I.
On July 6, 1992 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received from Justice.
On July 1, 1992 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Executive Comment Received from Commerce.
On May 12, 1992 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On January 14, 1992 in the House:
- Field Hearing Held in Galilee, Rhode Island.
On October 2, 1991 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 23, 1991 in the House:
- Field Hearings Held in Boston, Massachusetts.
On August 13, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Employment Opportunities.
On July 29, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
- Executive Comment Requested from Commerce, Interior, Labor, State, DOT, Treasury.
On July 16, 1991 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
- Referred to the House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
- Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor