+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by President.
- Became Public Law No: 111-78.
On October 7, 2009 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On September 25, 2009 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On September 24, 2009 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On September 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On August 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
On August 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate.
On July 31, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 101.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-240 .
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Mr. Oberstar asked unanimous consent to consider in the House.
- Considered by unanimous consent.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 30, 2009 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On June 30, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor