+ − Summary
+ − Actions (7)
On May 9, 1986 in the House:
- See H.R.4800 .
On February 6, 1986 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From Commerce.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 23, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Received From ITC.
On July 25, 1985 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from State, Treasury, Commerce, Labor, Customs, ITC, USTR.
On July 3, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Trade.
On June 27, 1985 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor