+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On October 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On September 30, 1999 in the House:
- GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2910 .
- Rule H. Res. 312 passed House.
- Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 312 .
- Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2910 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Makes in order the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure amendment in the nature of a substitute as an original bill for the purpose of amendment, modified by the amendment printed in H. Rept. 106-347 . Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- The Speaker designated the Honorable Bill Barrett to act as Chairman of the Committee.
- House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 312 and Rule XXIII.
- H.AMDT.507 Amendment offered by Mr. Weiner. Amendment deleted section 10 which authorized the FAA to install a Terminal Doppler Weather Radar in Kings County, New York.
- DEBATE - The Committee is debating the amendment offered by Mr. Weiner.
- H.AMDT.507 On agreeing to the Weiner amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
- The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2910 .
- The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
- The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
- On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 420 - 4 .
On September 29, 1999 in the House:
- Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 312 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2910 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Makes in order the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure amendment in the nature of a substitute as an original bill for the purpose of amendment, modified by the amendment printed in H. Rept. 106-347 . Measure will be read by section. Bill is open to amendments.
On September 27, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
- Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-335 .
On September 23, 1999 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 22, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Amendment
H.AMDT.507
Amendment deleted section 10 which authorized the FAA to install a Terminal Doppler Weather Radar in Kings County, New York.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor