+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On September 19, 2012 in the House:
- Mr. Denham moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2903 .
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On September 17, 2012 in the House:
- Committee on Homeland Security discharged.
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486.
On September 14, 2012 in the House:
- Reported by the Committee on 112-674, Part I.
- Referred sequentially to the House Committee on Homeland Security for a period ending not later than Sept. 17, 2012 for a period ending not later than September 17, 2012, for consideration of such provisions of the bill and amendment as fall within the jurisdiction of that committee pursuant to clause 1 of rule X.
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
On September 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
On September 13, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor