+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 113-289.
- Signed by President.
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6867)
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, read twice.
On December 8, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- Mr. Poe (TX) asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
- Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
- Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H884-8856; text as reported in House: CR H8848-8854)
- H.Amdt.1155 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Poe (TX). (consideration: CR H8854-8856; text: CR H8854-8856) Amendment inserts a complete new text.Amendment inserts a complete new text.
- H.Amdt.1155 On agreeing to the Poe (TX) amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
- On passage Passed without objection.
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On November 20, 2014 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5265-5266, E1186-1187)
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
H.Amdt.1155
Amendment inserts a complete new text.
+ − Sponsors (108)
Type:
Primary Sponsor