+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2006 in the House:
- Became Public Law No: 109-189.
- Signed by President.
On March 10, 2006 in the House:
- Presented to President.
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
- Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
On December 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 340.
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
On December 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
On July 27, 2005 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
On July 26, 2005 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: : 421 - 0 .
- Considered as unfinished business.
On July 25, 2005 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2894 .
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
On June 14, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor