+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 8, 1992 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On October 7, 1992 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3419 Amendment SP 3419 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- Amendment SP 3419 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
- S.AMDT.3419 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Leahy. In the nature of a substitute.
- Amendment SP 3419 proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Leahy.
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
On October 25, 1991 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280.
- Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Leahy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 102-195. Additional views filed.
On October 23, 1991 in the Senate:
- Committee on Agriculture received executive comment from U.S. Department of Agriculture.
- Committee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
On September 10, 1991 in the Senate:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Agricultural Production.
On July 29, 1991 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On July 25, 1991 in the House:
- Considered as unfinished business.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays : 328 - 67 .
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
On July 24, 1991 in the House:
- FURTHER POSTPONMENT OF VOTE - The Chair announced that the vote on the motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill H.R. 2893 , postponed on July 22, 1991, shall be further postponed until July 25, 1991.
On July 23, 1991 in the House:
- Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 104.
- At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walker objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed until July 24. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
- Considered under suspension of the rules.
- Mr. de la Garza moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
- Reported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 102-158.
On July 18, 1991 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On July 16, 1991 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Amendment
S.AMDT.3419
In the nature of a substitute.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor