+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 7, 1988 in the Senate:
- Became Public Law No: 100-326.
- Signed by President.
On May 26, 1988 in the Senate:
- Presented to President.
On May 25, 1988 in the Senate:
- Measure Signed in Senate.
On May 23, 1988 in the House:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On May 19, 1988 in the House:
- Cleared for White House.
On May 19, 1988 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
- Senate Committee on Agriculture discharged by Unanimous Consent.
On October 14, 1987 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
On October 13, 1987 in the House:
- Passed House by Voice Vote.
- Called up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
- Placed on Union Calendar No: 227.
- Reported to House by House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs. Report No: 100-367 .
- Reported to House by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 100-367 .
- Executive Comment Received From USDA.
On October 7, 1987 in the House:
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Ordered to be Reported .
On September 30, 1987 in the House:
- Ordered to be Reported .
- Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
On September 29, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee .
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 9, 1987 in the House:
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On August 12, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
On July 30, 1987 in the House:
- Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
- Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
- Referred to Subcommittee on Forest, Family Farms, and Energy.
On July 8, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition.
- Executive Comment Requested from USDA.
On July 1, 1987 in the House:
- Referred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
- Referred to House Committee on Agriculture.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor