+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On February 3, 1994 in the House:
- Subcommittee Hearings Held.
On September 22, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
On August 12, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
- Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
On August 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space and Technology.
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor