+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 1994 in the House:
- See H.R.4092 .
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Hearings Held in the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property on Title VI.
On November 5, 1993 in the House:
- Titles I, II, III, VII, IX and X referred to the Subcommittee on Crime and Criminal Justice.
- Titles IV and V referred to the Subcommittee on International Law, Immigration, and Refugees.
- Title VIII referred to the Subcommittee on Civil and Constitutional Rights.
- Title VI referred to the Subcommittee on Intellectual Property and Judicial Administration.
On September 21, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On September 8, 1993 in the House:
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
On August 4, 1993 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Judiciary.
- Sponsor introductory remarks on measure.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor