+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Message on Senate action sent to the House.
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4120 Amendment SA 4120 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
- S.Amdt.4120 Amendment SA 4120 proposed by Senator Walsh for Senator Johanns. (consideration: CR S6867; text: CR S6867)
- Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6867)
- Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
- Introduced in Senate
On September 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
On September 15, 2014 in the House:
- Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
- On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7506-7507)
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2866.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7506-7508)
- Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On July 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
- Introduced in House
+ − Amendment
S.Amdt.4120
To provide that surcharges received from the sale of coins under the Act are used to reduce the national debt.
+ − Sponsors (294)
Type:
Primary Sponsor