+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981. (consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2243-2244)
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Passed/agreed to in House: Pursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 380, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 297; H.R. 433; H.R. 478; H.R. 586; H.R. 721, as amended; H.R. 768; H.R. 810; H.R. 1205; H.R. 1260, as amended; H.R. 1324; H.R. 1448, as amended; H.R. 1475, as amended; H.R. 1480, as amended; H.R. 2862, as amended; H.R. 2955; and H.R. 2981.(consideration: CR H2235-2246; text: CR H2243-2244)
- Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 380, proceedings on H.R. 2862 are considered vacated.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
- DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2862.
- Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2175-2176; text: CR H2175-2176)
- Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
- Introduced in House
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor